This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:36 (UTC).

CHEN, LI RUEY vs. TAYLOR, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CHEN, LI RUEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TAYLOR, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************69-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LI RUEY CHEN

Defendant

WILLIAM TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAREN WASSON

ROBERT DUNAWAY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: WILLIAM TAYLOR,

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: WILLIAM TAYLOR,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: WASSON, KAREN REED; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less