This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/16/2022 at 20:01:38 (UTC).

CHAVEZ CEPEDA, OLGA ELIZABETH vs. SMITH, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 CHAVEZ CEPEDA, OLGA ELIZABETH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SMITH, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J Leach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************62-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbara J Leach

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLGA ELIZABETH CHAVEZ CEPEDA

Respondent

FERNANDO SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KENNETH KOMARA

Respondent Attorney

NATALIE HALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketComprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSurrender Firearms and Weapons to Law Enforcement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • HearingHearing: Injunctions - Leach, Barbara J (Actual: Leach, Barbara J); Location: Document Icon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Injunction After Hearing Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Injunction After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Injunctions - Leach, Barbara J (Actual: Leach, Barbara J)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketTemporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketTemporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Confidential Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL , NATALIE DIAN