This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/12/2022 at 15:33:48 (UTC).

CHAVEZ BERNAL, FRANCISCO vs. D HIGHHINS, RICHARDet al.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 CHAVEZ BERNAL, FRANCISCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against D HIGHHINS, RICHARD. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************21-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCO CHAVEZ BERNAL

Defendants

RICHARD D HIGHHINS

LOTTS CONCRETE PRODUCTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FABIO DURAN

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW HAFTEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED AS TO LOTTS CONCRETE PRODUCTS INC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: RICHARD D HIGGINS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: RICHARD D HIGGINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED AS TO LOTTS CONCRETE PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DURAN, FABIO SUAREZ; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOTT'S CONCRETE PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAFTEL MATTHEW J