This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/06/2022 at 15:34:45 (UTC).

CEVALLOS, WALTER ENRIQUE vs. JOWERS, TYRONE JASPERet al.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 CEVALLOS, WALTER ENRIQUE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOWERS, TYRONE JASPER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER ENRIQUE CEVALLOS

Defendants

TYRONE JASPER JOWERS

CR ENGLAND INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FABIO DURAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DURAN, FABIO SUAREZ; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. England, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURAN, FABIO