Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 22:18:42 (UTC).

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CAREvs.USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CAREvs USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************05-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACKSON GEORGES AAO

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DON MATHEWS

Defendant Attorney

BETH GORDON

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: by CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE

Complaint

Complaint

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: by CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Don Mathews; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BETH GORDON