This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2019 at 15:35:34 (UTC).

CASTRO RIVERA, ANGEL Let al. vs. YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF ORLANDO INCet al.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 CASTRO RIVERA, ANGEL L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF ORLANDO INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JULIA D JIMENEZ VEGA

ANGEL L CASTRO RIVERA

CARMELO ACEVEDO SANCHEZ

DAVID RAFAEL ACEVEDO CASTRO

Defendants

GUPSON JEANNELUS

YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF ORLANDO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN RODEMS

Defendant Attorney

CAREY BOS

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF ORLANDO, INC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Gupson Jeannelus

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice for Trial; Comments: sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: The Morgan Firm PA dba Morgan & Morgan; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less