This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2021 at 13:32:40 (UTC).

CASTLEBERRY, JENNIFERvs.SPEEDWAY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 CASTLEBERRY, JENNIFERvs SPEEDWAY LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L Strowbridge and Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Patricia L Strowbridge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER CASTLEBERRY

Defendant

SPEEDWAY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEREK METTS

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER MARINO

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Motion for Order

Motion for Order; Comments: REQUIRING NOTICE OF ELECTIVE SURGERY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice

Notice; Comments: TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Complaint

Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order; Comments: REQUIRING NOTICE OF ELECTIVE SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Metts Legal, P.A.; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPEEDWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER MARINO