This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/28/2021 at 02:30:24 (UTC).

CASTILLO, CLAUDIOvs.BACHATA BREEZE RESTAURANT INC

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 CASTILLO, CLAUDIOvs BACHATA BREEZE RESTAURANT INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAUDIO CASTILLO

Defendant

BACHATA BREEZE RESTAURANT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FANNY NATER

Defendant Attorney

ERNEST MYERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served as to bachata breeze restaurant

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: OF DEFENDANT S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: OF DEFENDANT S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served as to bachata breeze restaurant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: NATER, FANNY H; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less