This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/01/2023 at 16:00:55 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

TIFFANY SCHNEIDER AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

BARTLETT LEWIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email Atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email Atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less