This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/18/2023 at 15:57:26 (UTC).

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.vs.GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.

LILIANA PENA AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less