This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/19/2023 at 15:44:46 (UTC).

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A. vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A.

ALONDRA ACEVEDO-PIZARRO AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less