This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/20/2023 at 15:41:34 (UTC).

LILY LAROSA, JUAN CALDERON OLIVERAvs.AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 LILY LAROSA, JUAN CALDERON OLIVERAvs AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LILY LAROSA

JUAN CALDERON OLIVERA

Defendant

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAWNA SCHILLING

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA GROSS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(b)(6)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WEISSER, KEVIN JOSHUA; Amount: -410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(b)(6)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less