This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/09/2023 at 15:52:57 (UTC).

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************97-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

LIONEL AULT AAO

ADVENTHEALTH ORLANDO DBA

Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN DELL

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: (Second)

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: (Second)

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING JUDICIAL CONSTRUCTION OF 627.739. (PIP DEDUCTIBLE NOTICE) AND 627.371, FLA. STAT. (OIR PRIMARY JURISDICTION)

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce; Comments: (Second)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Comments: (Second)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DELL, STEVEN GERARD; Amount: -90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less