This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/25/2023 at 15:53:27 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING vs. ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2023 CAREFIRST IMAGING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

SHARON STOWE AAO

Defendant

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

ANNIE BELJOUR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less