This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/25/2023 at 15:40:45 (UTC).

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC vs. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/26/2023 MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************47-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC

JOSEPH NOTUS AAO

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less