This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/25/2023 at 15:51:39 (UTC).

LC AUTOGLASS SERVICES INCvs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2023 LC AUTOGLASS SERVICES INCvs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************83-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LC AUTOGLASS SERVICES INC

JEISSON MARTINEZ AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL BREHNE

Defendant Attorney

MARSHA MOSES

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served - Progressive American Insurance Company

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

Motion for Default to Court

Motion for Default to Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Default to Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served - Progressive American Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Michael B Brehne Brehne; Amount: -90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less