This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/13/2023 at 15:42:10 (UTC).

SAFEWAY CALIBRATIONS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 SAFEWAY CALIBRATIONS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAFEWAY CALIBRATIONS LLC

LIANNIS BELLO AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

BROOKE NATTKEMPER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to Complaint

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY-Served

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY-Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Service of Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ENGLAND, WILLIAM SCOTT; Amount: -195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInterrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less