This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/18/2023 at 15:48:27 (UTC).

CROSS REHAB CHIROPRACTIC LLC vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 CROSS REHAB CHIROPRACTIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CROSS REHAB CHIROPRACTIC LLC

MISSAINA SEIDE AAO

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE POPRITKIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less