This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/29/2023 at 10:35:13 (UTC).

UNIQUE AUTO GLASS FLORIDAvs.ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 UNIQUE AUTO GLASS FLORIDAvs ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIQUE AUTO GLASS FLORIDA

MAINOR SOTO AAO

Defendant

ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Correspondence

Correspondence

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ENGLAND, WILLIAM SCOTT; Amount: -90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less