This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/07/2023 at 15:34:30 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCvs.VELAZQUEZ, ANGEL MANUEL et al.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCvs VELAZQUEZ, ANGEL MANUEL was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

ANGEL MANUEL VELAZQUEZ

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

ORANGE COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

MELISSA SWEENEY

BARBARA M TORRES PEREZ

ANGEL M. VELAZQUEZ AKA

BARBARA MICHELLE TORRES PEREZ AKA

BARBARA TORRES PEREZ AKA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COREY LEWIS

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTA JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Reply

Reply

Answer

Answer; Comments: AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Order Appointing Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Certificate

Certificate

Form "A"

Form "A"

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Process Server

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appoint for Service of Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification Settlement Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less