This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/04/2023 at 15:49:37 (UTC).

ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP, INC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************08-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIANCE CHIROPRACTIC GROUP, INC

SYLFILIA TOUSSAINT SUB

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

Defendant Attorney

RONALDA STEVENS-ROGERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Cancellation; Comments: March 18, 2024, commencing at 10:00 a.m.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Cancellation; Comments: March 18, 2024, commencing at 10:00 a.m.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SOOKLAL, DAVE TRISTIAN; Amount: -90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInterrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less