This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/18/2023 at 15:49:43 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY AND CONVENIENT CARE vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY AND CONVENIENT CARE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************05-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY AND CONVENIENT CARE

EMMANUEL ALEXANDRE AAO

Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Memorandum

Memorandum

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: RODRIGUEZ, EDUARDO; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less