This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/05/2023 at 15:49:43 (UTC).

COASTLINE IMAGING INC. vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 COASTLINE IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************85-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COASTLINE IMAGING INC.

YOVANA ARAUCO ANCO AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HOAG

Defendant Attorney

ALEXIS TUCKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED - INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED - INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert David Hoag; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less