This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/10/2023 at 15:41:08 (UTC).

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. vs. ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************03-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.

PAULO MYLLA AAO

Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

ANNIE BELJOUR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: Complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less