This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/05/2023 at 15:34:21 (UTC).

HHE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYvs.PRIME LEASING AND SALES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, SIXTO VARGAS

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 HHE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYvs PRIME LEASING AND SALES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, SIXTO VARGAS was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HHE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

PRIME LEASING AND SALES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SIXTO VARGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDON DEGEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EM ATTY

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EM ATTY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: SIXTO VARGAS- POSTED

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: PRIME LEASING AND SALES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN- POSTED

Answer

Answer; Comments: SENT TO THE JUDGE

Designation of Email Address for a Party Not Represented by

Designation of Email Address for a Party Not Represented by; Comments: an Attorney

Notice for Trial Non-Jury

Notice for Trial Non-Jury; Comments: sent to Judge

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Correspondence

Correspondence

Motion to Appear by Phone

Motion to Appear by Phone

Order on Motion

Order on Motion; Comments: to appear remotely

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder of Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder of Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

HearingHearing: Non-Jury Trial - Caraballo, Tina L (Actual: Caraballo, Tina L); Location: Hearing Room/Courtroom 370

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCourt Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

DocketHEARING - Non-Jury Trial - Caraballo, Tina L (Actual: Caraballo, Tina L)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Motion; Comments: to appear remotely

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Appear by Phone

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice for Trial Non-Jury; Comments: sent to Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; Comments: SENT TO THE JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: PRIME LEASING AND SALES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPAN- POSTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: SIXTO VARGAS- POSTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Winderweedle Haines Ward and Woodman PA; Amount: -205.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less