This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/07/2023 at 15:33:14 (UTC).

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC vs. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARYet al.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

Defendants

MARIA V ROMERO

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY

HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF SKY LAKE SOUTH UNITS SIX

MARIA ROMERO AKA

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLINE CALHOUN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MARIA V ROMERO

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF SKY LAKE SOUTH UNITS AND SEVEN INC.-SERVED

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT-SERVED

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY 1-SERVED

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Note and Mortgage

Note and Mortgage

Certificate

Certificate

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Form "A"

Form "A"

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MARIA V ROMERO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF SKY LAKE SOUTH UNITS AND SEVEN INC.-SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT-SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY 1-SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/08/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 960.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNote and Mortgage

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketForm "A"

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less