This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/18/2023 at 15:56:07 (UTC).

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.

ANDREW MACKRELL AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

MARIA PINTO

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Privilege Log

Privilege Log; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less