This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/14/2023 at 15:59:23 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************93-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

EDWIN VARGAS ROA AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

JOEL THALER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less