This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/14/2023 at 16:01:46 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************11-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

VERONICA ROBLES AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN SEEKAMP

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED- AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED- AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less