This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/16/2023 at 15:46:24 (UTC).

OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC vs. INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCALA INJURY CLINIC LLC

LATWANDA WASHINGTON AAO

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

MELISSA VAUGHAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less