This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/10/2023 at 16:02:49 (UTC).

GENESIS AUTO GLASS LLCvs.INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 GENESIS AUTO GLASS LLCvs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************95-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENESIS AUTO GLASS LLC

BONITA COPELAND MAJOR AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN LAGROW

Defendant Attorney

ALEXIS TUCKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to plaintiff's discovery to defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to plaintiff's discovery to defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less