This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/08/2023 at 15:43:59 (UTC).

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2023 NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************36-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NOLASCO CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.

DULCE BARRIENTOS AAO

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less