This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/19/2019 at 11:24:42 (UTC).

EXCELLENT PERFORMANCE INC vs. ALEX ABERNATHY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2012 EXCELLENT PERFORMANCE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEX ABERNATHY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************47-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXCELLENT PERFORMANCE INC

Defendant

ALEX ABERNATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY BECKER

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ISSUED 5/9/12; ORG TO INVESTIGATIVE PROCESS; COPY TO ATTY SASE

Request

Request; Comments: for cancellation of pretrial conference 06/26/2012 @ 8:15am

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2012

DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Case Closed Prior to Hearing Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2012
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2012
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2012
View Court Documents

DocketRequest; Comments: for cancellation of pretrial conference 06/26/2012 @ 8:15am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ISSUED 5/9/12; ORG TO INVESTIGATIVE PROCESS; COPY TO ATTY SASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2012
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2012
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2012

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: BECKER, JEFFREY R, Esquire; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2012

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2012

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less