This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/03/2023 at 11:48:51 (UTC).

KC QUALITY CARE LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 KC QUALITY CARE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************21-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KC QUALITY CARE LLC

ASO DIDIER FRANCOIS

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

Defendant Attorney

FARAH SHIRAH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Withdrawal

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: ON THE PLEADING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Withdrawal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

HearingHearing: Motion - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H); Location: Hearing Room/Courtroom 370

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCourt Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketHEARING - Motion - Jewett, Evellen H (Actual: Jewett, Evellen H)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: ON THE PLEADING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
05/24/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SOOKLAL, DAVE TRISTIAN; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInterrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint; Comments: FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less