This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/06/2023 at 15:37:34 (UTC).

KC QUALITY CARE, LLC, vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2023 KC QUALITY CARE, LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KC QUALITY CARE, LLC,

ASO BENTZ TOUSSAINT

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: service of process

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: service of process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SOOKLAL, DAVE TRISTIAN; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: PARTIES NAMES ARE MISSING/BLANK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less