This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/19/2023 at 16:22:53 (UTC).

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLP vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************38-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLP

FABIANO LEUCK DOS REIS AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Answer

Answer

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: David B Alexander; Amount: -90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less