This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/05/2023 at 01:55:48 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLCvs.AUGUSTINA GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLCvs AUGUSTINA GONZALEZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

AUGUSTINA GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAROLD SCHERR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: EM ATTY

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED - AUGUSTINA GONZALEZ

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2023

HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCourt Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED - AUGUSTINA GONZALEZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Harold Earl Scherr; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less