This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/02/2023 at 15:36:52 (UTC).

GSMPS MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-RP2 U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEEvs.MOORE, FRANKIE et al.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 GSMPS MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-RP2 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEEvs MOORE, FRANKIE was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GSMPS MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-RP2 U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

FRANKIE MOORE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA

NEXT LEVEL ROOFERS INC

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

EQUIFIRST PROPERTIES LLC

LIMA ONE CAPITAL LLC

FRANKIE MAE MOORE AKA

A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEXT LEVEL ROOFERS DBA

ORANGE COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER LANNING

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTA JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Final Disposition Form

Final Disposition Form

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Answer

Answer

Notice

Notice; Comments: Of Substitution Of Counsel Within Clerks Office and Designation Of New Primary And Secondary Email

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice

Notice

Certificate

Certificate

Form "A"

Form "A"

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Of Substitution Of Counsel Within Clerks Office and Designation Of New Primary And Secondary Email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF RMFM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification Settlement Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less