This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/18/2023 at 15:58:31 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INCvs.VIVIAN SINGH

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INCvs VIVIAN SINGH was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

Defendant

VIVIAN SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALPH MARCADIS

Defendant Attorney

BRYAN DANGLER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons to Show Cause

Summons to Show Cause

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Jewett, Evellen H; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Jewett, Evellen H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MARCADIS SINGER PA; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing; Comments: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less