This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/17/2023 at 15:58:08 (UTC).

NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA LLC vs. GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA LLC

TIANNA GRAHAM AAO

Defendant

GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

LASHAWNDA JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED- GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Defendant, Greenwich Insurance Company

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023

DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Defendant, Greenwich Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED- GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less