This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 10/22/2023 at 17:04:02 (UTC).

CUNMIT INCvs.DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 CUNMIT INCvs DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************54-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUNMIT INC

JOHN TANGO AAO

ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS DBA

Defendant

DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JACOBSON

Defendant Attorney

KYLE SWANSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Lee M. Jacobson; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less