This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/15/2023 at 15:48:23 (UTC).

WEST ORLANDO CHIROPRACTIC CARE LLC vs. UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 WEST ORLANDO CHIROPRACTIC CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEST ORLANDO CHIROPRACTIC CARE LLC

GENEL ELISKA AAO

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGRID ADAMS

Defendant Attorney

WADE CONNER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ADAMS, INGRID FRANCOEUR; Amount: -90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less