This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/19/2023 at 15:33:02 (UTC).

MELIHERCSIK, ANNE Let al. vs. AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2023 MELIHERCSIK, ANNE L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret H Schreiber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret H Schreiber

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANNE L MELIHERCSIK

RICHARD S MELIHERCSIK

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRISCILLA PEREZ-GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: acceptance of Service of Process

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: acceptance of Service of Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Priscilla Perez-Gomez; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less