This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/14/2023 at 16:00:07 (UTC).

SEASIDE SPINE MARY ESTHER, LLC. vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 SEASIDE SPINE MARY ESTHER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEASIDE SPINE MARY ESTHER, LLC.

DAVID RUSSELL AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

JOHN ECKARD

 

Court Documents

Answer to Interrogatories

Answer to Interrogatories

Answer to Interrogatories

Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPrivilege Log

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/15/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less