This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/13/2023 at 15:52:43 (UTC).

SILVER HILLS HEALTH AND REHAB CLINIC vs. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 SILVER HILLS HEALTH AND REHAB CLINIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SILVER HILLS HEALTH AND REHAB CLINIC

LUC PASCAL SUB

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SOOKLAL, DAVE TRISTIAN; Amount: -90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInterrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less