This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/11/2023 at 08:16:36 (UTC).

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A. vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A.

LING WANG AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER BERTELS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less