This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/05/2023 at 15:58:13 (UTC).

KC QUALITY CARE LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2023 KC QUALITY CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************96-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KC QUALITY CARE LLC

PAMELA SANTIAGO AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVE SOOKLAL

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL ROSENBERG

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SOOKLAL, DAVE TRISTIAN; Amount: -90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInterrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less