This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/21/2023 at 15:31:54 (UTC).

NARVAEZ MANTILLA, ANTONIOvs.UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 NARVAEZ MANTILLA, ANTONIOvs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Heather Pinder Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Heather Pinder Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTONIO NARVAEZ MANTILLA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT KRAPF

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND REPLY

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND REPLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Grant William Krapf; Amount: -410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516(b)(1)(A)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less