This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/16/2023 at 15:35:51 (UTC).

ZERO NARCOOSSEE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO vs. FELLING, DANIEL Ret al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 ZERO NARCOOSSEE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FELLING, DANIEL R. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************36-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZERO NARCOOSSEE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY CO

Defendants

DANIEL R FELLING

JULIE F FELLING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDON DEGEL

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN CLARK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: julie

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: daniel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Correspondence

Correspondence

 

Docket Entries

07/16/2023

DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: A notorized Affidavit of Military Service Needs to be Filed before 07.10.2023 can be issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: julie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Winderweedle Haines Ward and Woodman PA; Amount: -420.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less