This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 10/03/2023 at 15:41:28 (UTC).

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY vs. JUAN GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against JUAN GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************95-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

LLOYD ZEIDNER AAO

Defendant

JUAN GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN BARKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED- JUAN C GOMEZ

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED- JUAN C GOMEZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: SUMMON'S PAID BUT NOT PROVIDED. ALSO MISSING STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT FORM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Law Office of Stephen Barker; Amount: -400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less